U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:21-cv-03268
  • Case Name: Broadnax, Jr. (ID 107257) v. Roberts
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Record on Appeal Retrieved by 10CCA]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • December 29, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • December 08, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • December 08, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • December 08, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • December 08, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 16, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.