U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02367
  • Case Name: Snowden v. Life Insurance Company of North America et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 10, 2023: [Stay Deadlines]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 13, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 17, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Order]
  • October 28, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • October 28, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • October 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 23, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 23, 2022: [State Court Records]
  • September 19, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 16, 2022: [Recusal]
  • September 16, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • September 16, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 16, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 16, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.