U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01210
  • Case Name: Andrews v. Yeager
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 20, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 12, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 29, 2022: [Counterclaim]
  • November 04, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • November 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 05, 2022: [Order]
  • October 04, 2022: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 16, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 16, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.