U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02368
  • Case Name: Williams v Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 20, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 13, 2023: [Reassigning Case]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • December 15, 2022: [Response to Motion]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • October 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 19, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.