U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02370
  • Case Name: Guesby v. Bert Nash Community Mental Health Center, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 13, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • January 04, 2023: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • December 06, 2022: [Summons Issued]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.