U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02372
  • Case Name: Gonzalez v. Tyson Fresh Meats, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • January 18, 2023: [Answer to Complaint]
  • January 18, 2023: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • January 04, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 19, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.