U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04047
  • Case Name: Bevens v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • December 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • November 23, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.