U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01211
  • Case Name: Morris v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 19, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • November 08, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 26, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 22, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 20, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.