U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02376
  • Case Name: Optiv Security Inc. v. Guidepoint Security, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 22, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File]
  • December 14, 2022: [Leave]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Transcript]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order]
  • November 09, 2022: [Status Conference]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 14, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 07, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 06, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 06, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • October 06, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 20, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 20, 2022: [Preliminary Injunction]
  • September 20, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • September 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.