U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02374
  • Case Name: United States of America v. Tresner
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 29, 2025: [Certificate of Service]
  • April 15, 2025: [Writ of Garnishment]
  • April 15, 2025: [Application for Writ of Garnishment]
October, 2024
  • October 02, 2024: [Garnishee Order]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Setting Scheduling Conference]
  • January 19, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 14, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • September 29, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • September 29, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 26, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 20, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.