U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02377
  • Case Name: Madison v. Emerald Transformer PPM LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
September, 2022
  • September 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 21, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • September 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.