U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03205
  • Case Name: Michalec v. Payne
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Terminating Referral Judge]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 09, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • September 23, 2022: [~Util - Set Deadlines]
  • September 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • September 22, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.