U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02378
  • Case Name: Amerisure Partners Insurance Company v. Everest Indemnity Insurance Company et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Party]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • January 18, 2023: [Dismiss Party]
  • January 18, 2023: [Continue]
  • January 06, 2023: [Show Cause]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
November, 2022
  • November 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
September, 2022
  • September 22, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • September 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • September 22, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • September 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.