U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-04049
  • Case Name: Allen v. Knowlton et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Default Judgment]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • November 14, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 14, 2022: [Reconsideration]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • November 03, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • November 01, 2022: [Clerks Entry of Default]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Supplement]
  • October 27, 2022: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice Re Pro Se Mailing]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.