U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02381
  • Case Name: Marmon et al v. RPS AUTO, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
  • January 12, 2023: [Notice to Take Deposition]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 27, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings - Public]
  • December 13, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 13, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 02, 2022: [Protective Order]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 21, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 04, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 17, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 17, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Return of Service]
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.