U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02379
  • Case Name: Williams v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • November 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 23, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 22, 2022: [Financial Affidavit]
  • September 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 22, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.