U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01214
  • Case Name: Hill v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Entry of Appearance]
  • January 03, 2023: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • November 16, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 26, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 23, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.