U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03207
  • Case Name: Lewis v. Dodge City Community College
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 14, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
  • November 14, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • November 10, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • November 10, 2022: [Complaint]
  • November 03, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • November 03, 2022: [Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 27, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
September, 2022
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • September 23, 2022: [Case Transferred In - District Transfer]
  • September 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Transfer Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.