U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01217
  • Case Name: Depositors Insurance Company et al v. Evan-Talan Homes, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
September, 2024
  • September 27, 2024: [Order]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 06, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 04, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 19, 2022: [Status Report]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2022: [Show Cause]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • September 26, 2022: [Reassigning Case]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.