U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02383
  • Case Name: Hummell v. MV Realty of Kansas LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Letter]
  • October 25, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • October 19, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • October 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • October 05, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • October 04, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • September 30, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • September 27, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 23, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.