U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:20-cv-01226
  • Case Name: United States of America v. $19,525.37 in United States Currency, et al.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Redacted Document]
  • October 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Case]
  • October 05, 2022: [Stay Case]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.