U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03210
  • Case Name: Cloud v. Kansas, State of et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Mail Returned]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
  • November 18, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 18, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • November 15, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 02, 2022: [Response to Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
October, 2022
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Expedite]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • October 14, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Order]
  • October 06, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
September, 2022
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • September 26, 2022: [Complaint]
  • September 26, 2022: [Expedite]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.