U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02384
  • Case Name: Davidson v. Dairy Farmers of America, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 20, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 11, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • January 05, 2023: [Extension of Time]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 23, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 23, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 25, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 18, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 13, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 26, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 26, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 26, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.