U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03212
  • Case Name: McGee (ID 113662) v. Rule
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 31, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • October 13, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Response to Order]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • September 26, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 26, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.