U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02385
  • Case Name: Aiken et al v. Assurance Health Shawnee, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Hearing]
April, 2025
  • April 30, 2025: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • April 30, 2025: [Hearing]
September, 2024
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion to Amend Scheduling Order]
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Notice of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 16, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 02, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 02, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 18, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 18, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 04, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Out of Time]
  • October 26, 2022: [Leave to File Out of Time]
  • October 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 01, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
September, 2022
  • September 27, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 27, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 27, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.