U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01218
  • Case Name: Mai v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Social Security - Plaintiffs Initial Brief]
December, 2022
  • December 14, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • December 12, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
  • December 02, 2022: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • December 02, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Social Security Administrative Record]
  • November 29, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 04, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
September, 2022
  • September 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • September 29, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • September 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • September 27, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • September 27, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 27, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.