U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02387
  • Case Name: Hoyt v. USD 234 Fort Scott et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Judgment]
  • December 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
November, 2022
  • November 15, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • November 09, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • November 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Response to Motion]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • October 12, 2022: [Order]
  • October 11, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 11, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • October 11, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
  • October 11, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 05, 2022: [State Court Records]
September, 2022
  • September 29, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • September 27, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 27, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • September 27, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.