U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01227
  • Case Name: Baker v. Braum's, Inc. et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 13, 2023: [Comparative Fault Designation]
December, 2022
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • December 09, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • December 05, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 05, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 02, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • December 01, 2022: [Extension of Time]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 03, 2022: [Notice of Service]
October, 2022
  • October 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.