U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02406
  • Case Name: Kennedy v. Experian Information Solutions, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [~Util - Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Notice of Settlement]
December, 2022
  • December 07, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 06, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 06, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 02, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 01, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 01, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
October, 2022
  • October 27, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • October 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.