U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02405
  • Case Name: Capitol Specialty Insurance Company v. Rubelmann et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Answer to Counterclaim]
  • December 13, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • December 02, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • December 02, 2022: [Counterclaim]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 11, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Response]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 07, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 07, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.