U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02404
  • Case Name: Owolabi et al v. United States Citizenship and Immigration Services et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Terminate Civil Case]
  • December 07, 2022: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
October, 2022
  • October 25, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 21, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • October 07, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • October 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.