U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03237
  • Case Name: Maier v. Bureau of Consular Affairs et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 05, 2022: [Mail Returned]
November, 2022
  • November 21, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • November 21, 2022: [Exhibits]
  • November 08, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Issuance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 08, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • November 08, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Issuance]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Order]
  • October 24, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 24, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • October 24, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • October 11, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • October 07, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.