U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02408
  • Case Name: Optiv Security Inc. v. Guidepoint Security, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Protective Order]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Set Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 20, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 13, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 08, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Amended Answer to Complaint]
  • November 11, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • November 08, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 08, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 07, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 04, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 04, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 18, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 17, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 17, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 14, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 10, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 07, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 07, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.