U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03234
  • Case Name: Macomber v. Hudson
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Mail Returned]
  • January 03, 2023: [Judgment]
  • January 03, 2023: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Response to Habeas Petition]
October, 2022
  • October 11, 2022: [Show Cause]
  • October 07, 2022: [Notice of Deficiency - Prisoner Case]
  • October 07, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.