U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01229
  • Case Name: Ford v. Casey's General Stores, Inc.
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 20, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 10, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 26, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • December 22, 2022: [Certificate of Compliance]
  • December 21, 2022: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue]
  • November 29, 2022: [Continue]
  • November 28, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 09, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • November 09, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 09, 2022: [Jury Demand]
  • November 09, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 09, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 08, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
October, 2022
  • October 19, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 17, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • October 11, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 10, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 10, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.