U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02411
  • Case Name: Coates v. Reichert et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Docket Annotation]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 23, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Waiver of Service Executed]
  • October 17, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 10, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • October 10, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 10, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.