U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02413
  • Case Name: Lindsey v. Unified Government of Wyandotte County
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Joint Mediation Notice]
  • January 20, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 09, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance]
  • January 06, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
December, 2022
  • December 27, 2022: [Mediation Minute Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • December 15, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 14, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • November 30, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 30, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Protective Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • November 17, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • November 16, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • November 15, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • November 01, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 01, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 01, 2022: [Dismiss]
October, 2022
  • October 17, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • October 13, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 13, 2022: [Recusal]
  • October 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 12, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Certificate of Service]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 11, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.