U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02409
  • Case Name: Paulakovich v. USD 233 Olathe
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 12, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
  • January 09, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 09, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 06, 2023: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
December, 2022
  • December 29, 2022: [Scheduling Order]
  • December 23, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • December 21, 2022: [Scheduling Conference]
  • December 16, 2022: [Amend Complaint]
  • December 13, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 12, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 09, 2022: [Notice of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 08, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 07, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 11, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.