U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02414
  • Case Name: Galindo et al v. Adrian et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
March, 2025
  • March 13, 2025: [Reply to Response to Motion]
February, 2025
  • February 28, 2025: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • February 07, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 19, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • January 13, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 13, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 12, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 10, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Expediting Briefing Deadline]
  • December 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 28, 2022: [Stay Discovery]
  • December 27, 2022: [Answer to Amended Complaint]
  • December 22, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 22, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • December 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Dismiss]
  • December 14, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
  • December 09, 2022: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • December 06, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • December 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Motion and R&R Deadlines/Hearings - Public]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 28, 2022: [Stay Discovery]
  • November 23, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
  • November 23, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • November 23, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • November 23, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 23, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • November 16, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 16, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 01, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 21, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 21, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 17, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • October 12, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 12, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 11, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • October 11, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 11, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.