U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03264
  • Case Name: Strader (ID 66677) v. State of Kansas et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 13, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • December 06, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • December 06, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • December 01, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • November 30, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • November 29, 2022: [Order]
  • November 28, 2022: [Judgment]
  • November 28, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • November 16, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2022: [Extension of Time]
  • November 09, 2022: [Order]
October, 2022
  • October 20, 2022: [Show Cause - Prisoner Case]
  • October 20, 2022: [~Util - Add and Terminate Parties]
  • October 19, 2022: [Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.