U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03265
  • Case Name: Gilbert v. Soldan et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 01, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • November 30, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • November 09, 2022: [Record on Appeal Retrieved by 10CCA]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order]
  • November 08, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis (Prisoner Case)]
  • November 08, 2022: [Appeal In Forma Pauperis Prisoner Case]
  • November 08, 2022: [Appeal Number Information]
  • November 07, 2022: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • November 07, 2022: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • November 07, 2022: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
October, 2022
  • October 24, 2022: [Judgment]
  • October 24, 2022: [Memorandum & Order - DO NOT USE TO RULE ON MOTIONS]
  • October 19, 2022: [Notice of Removal]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.