U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02426
  • Case Name: Berberich v. Kansas City Southern Railway Company
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
October, 2024
  • October 17, 2024: [Appeal Number Information]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for Judgment]
  • October 03, 2024: [Order on Motion for New Trial]
January, 2023
  • January 19, 2023: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 17, 2023: [Scheduling Order]
  • January 13, 2023: [Scheduling Conference]
  • January 03, 2023: [Certificate of Service]
November, 2022
  • November 16, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 16, 2022: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • November 15, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • November 15, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
October, 2022
  • October 26, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 26, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 25, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Pro Hac Vice]
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 19, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 19, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.