U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03019
  • Case Name: Gonzales v. Wray et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [~Util - Set Hearings]
  • January 18, 2023: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • November 02, 2022: [Order]
  • November 02, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 01, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
October, 2022
  • October 21, 2022: [Notice to Pro Se Re Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • October 21, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • October 21, 2022: [Summary Judgment]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Hearing]
  • October 20, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.