U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01239
  • Case Name: Means v. Goodland Regional Medical Center et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 16, 2023: [Memorandum in Opposition to Motion]
  • January 12, 2023: [Order on Motion for Protective Order]
  • January 11, 2023: [Protective Order]
  • January 05, 2023: [Initial Order Regarding Planning and Scheduling]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • January 03, 2023: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • January 03, 2023: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 19, 2022: [Corporate Disclosure Statement]
  • December 19, 2022: [Answer to Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 18, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
October, 2022
  • October 28, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • October 26, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • October 20, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • October 20, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • October 20, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • October 20, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.