U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:22-cv-03282
  • Case Name: Scriven v. Vital Core, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
April, 2025
  • April 25, 2025: [Order on Motion to Stay Deadlines]
  • April 22, 2025: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • April 21, 2025: [Stay Deadlines]
  • April 17, 2025: [Notice to Pro Se Re Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • April 17, 2025: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • April 17, 2025: [Summary Judgment]
  • April 16, 2025: [Withdrawal and Entry of Appearance of Substituted Counsel]
  • April 09, 2025: [Notice of Service]
March, 2025
  • March 20, 2025: [Order]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Scheduling Order Deadlines]
  • March 20, 2025: [~Util - Set Deadlines/Hearings]
  • March 18, 2025: [Discovery Hearing]
  • March 13, 2025: [Order on Motion for Hearing]
  • March 12, 2025: [Hearing]
October, 2024
  • October 10, 2024: [Response to Motion]
  • October 09, 2024: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • October 08, 2024: [Expediting Briefing Deadline]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Reconsideration]
  • October 08, 2024: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • October 04, 2024: [Order]
  • October 03, 2024: [Reconsideration]
  • October 03, 2024: [Extension of Time]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Terminating Referral Judge]
December, 2022
  • December 08, 2022: [Amended Complaint]
November, 2022
  • November 10, 2022: [Affidavit]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for TRO]
October, 2022
  • October 31, 2022: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • October 31, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • October 31, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.