U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 5:20-cv-03200
  • Case Name: Vann v. Fewell et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 06, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appeal Number Information]
  • May 01, 2025: [Preliminary Record on Appeal Sent]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
  • May 01, 2025: [Appeal Filing Fee Waived/Not Paid]
  • May 01, 2025: [Notice of Appeal - Final Judgment]
  • May 01, 2025: [Order]
March, 2025
  • March 18, 2025: [Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • March 18, 2025: [Order on Motion for Order]
October, 2024
  • October 11, 2024: [Order]
  • October 11, 2024: [File Excess Pages]
  • October 07, 2024: [Response to Motion]
September, 2024
  • September 30, 2024: [Affidavit]
  • September 26, 2024: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 26, 2024: [Motions No Longer Referred]
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Minute Order]
  • January 23, 2023: [~Util - Add and Terminate Judges]
  • January 12, 2023: [Return of Service of Summons UNEXECUTED]
  • January 12, 2023: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
December, 2022
  • December 21, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • December 20, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 22, 2022: [Alias Summons Issued]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order]
  • November 21, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • November 18, 2022: [SEALED Document]
  • November 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 18, 2022: [Leave to File Under Seal]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer]
  • November 10, 2022: [Extension of Time to File Answer]
  • November 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Appoint Counsel]
  • November 04, 2022: [Notice of Change of Address (Prisoner)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.