U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02476
  • Case Name: Farr v. United States Government et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 24, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 23, 2023: [Notice of Hearing]
  • January 23, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Notice to Pro Se Re Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 20, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 20, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 20, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 19, 2023: [Order on Motion for Default Judgment]
  • January 18, 2023: [Temporary Restraining Order]
  • January 18, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 18, 2023: [File Excess Pages]
  • January 18, 2023: [Amend Complaint]
  • January 17, 2023: [Notice to Pro Se Re Motion for Summary Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 17, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 17, 2023: [Summary Judgment]
  • January 17, 2023: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 11, 2023: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • January 11, 2023: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • January 11, 2023: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • January 10, 2023: [Order on Motion to Amend Complaint]
  • January 09, 2023: [Amend Complaint]
  • January 09, 2023: [Reply to Response to Motion]
  • January 09, 2023: [Amended Complaint]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice (Other)]
  • January 09, 2023: [Notice of Service]
  • January 06, 2023: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • January 06, 2023: [Response to Motion]
  • January 04, 2023: [Order on Motion to Stay Discovery]
  • January 03, 2023: [Order on Motion for Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 03, 2023: [Leave to Amend Complaint]
  • January 03, 2023: [Response to Motion]
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Default Judgment]
  • December 30, 2022: [Response to Motion]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Docket Text Modification]
  • December 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • December 30, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • December 30, 2022: [Notice of Service]
  • December 20, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 19, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages]
  • December 16, 2022: [Motions No Longer Referred]
  • December 15, 2022: [File Excess Pages]
  • December 15, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 15, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss for Failure to State a Claim]
  • December 15, 2022: [Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction]
  • December 14, 2022: [Stay Discovery]
  • December 13, 2022: [Memorandum in Support of Motion]
  • December 13, 2022: [Dismiss]
  • December 12, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 08, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
November, 2022
  • November 30, 2022: [Clerks Order Extending Time to Answer]
  • November 28, 2022: [Docket Annotation]
  • November 22, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Filing Fee Paid]
  • November 21, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 21, 2022: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.