U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01260
  • Case Name: Fowler v. Social Security Administration, Commissioner of
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 30, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 19, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • December 07, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
  • December 02, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED as to USA]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Summons Issued as to USA]
  • November 22, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 22, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • November 22, 2022: [Proceed In Forma Pauperis]
  • November 22, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • November 22, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
  • November 22, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.