U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 2:22-cv-02481
  • Case Name: Simons v. USF Holland, LLC
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
May, 2025
  • May 12, 2025: [Status Report]
January, 2023
  • January 18, 2023: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • January 17, 2023: [Affidavit]
December, 2022
  • December 28, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
  • December 23, 2022: [Summons Issued]
  • December 22, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • December 22, 2022: [Entry of Appearance]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.