U.S. Civil Court Records for the District of Kansas

kansas Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. Civil Court for the District of Kansas
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 6:22-cv-01262
  • Case Name: Joe Hand Promotions, Inc. v. Sam Revolver, LLC et al
  • Filing Type: Civil
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 23, 2023: [Clerks Entry of Default]
  • January 20, 2023: [Application for Clerks Entry of Default]
December, 2022
  • December 09, 2022: [Return of Service of Summons EXECUTED]
  • December 01, 2022: [Summons Issued]
November, 2022
  • November 23, 2022: [Notice of Judge Assignment]
  • November 23, 2022: [Designation of Place of Trial]
  • November 23, 2022: [Civil Cover Sheet]
  • November 23, 2022: [Complaint (attorney)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.